01/01/1895 |
Joined the Brooklyn Whales. |
01/01/1896 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 55 (55); Eye: 55 (55). |
01/01/1897 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 55 (55); Power: 55 (55); Eye: 60 (60). |
01/01/1898 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 55 (55). |
01/01/1899 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
09/20/1899 |
Released by the Brooklyn Whales. |
01/01/1900 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 55 (55). |
01/01/1901 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 50 (50); Eye: 55 (55). |
02/10/1901 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $550 with the Richmond Rifles organization. |
04/17/1901 |
Released by the Richmond Rifles. |
05/15/1901 |
Signed a 1-year contract worth a total of $400 with the Pittsburgh Oilers organization. |
06/16/1901 |
Injured (mild oblique strain),day-to-day for 2 days. |
01/01/1902 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 55 (55). |
01/01/1903 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 50 (50); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 55 (55). |
01/01/1904 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 45 (45); Power: 45 (45); Eye: 55 (55). |
05/23/1904 |
Released by the Pittsburgh Oilers. |
08/05/1904 |
Retired from professional baseball. |