04/14/1902 |
Joined the Mountain Academy Blacks. |
01/01/1903 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 35 (50). |
03/15/1903 |
Was not drafted and became a free agent. |
01/01/1904 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (45); Power: 40 (45); Eye: 35 (50). |
01/01/1905 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 30 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 40 (50). |
01/01/1906 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 25 (40); Power: 40 (55); Eye: 30 (45). |
10/12/1906 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Boston Banshees organization. |
01/01/1907 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (45); Power: 40 (50); Eye: 35 (45). |
01/01/1908 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 35 (45); Power: 35 (45); Eye: 50 (55). |
07/06/1908 |
Released by the Boston organization. |
09/15/1908 |
Retired from professional baseball. |