06/05/2012 |
Drafted by the New York Mets in the 12th round of the 2012 MLB June Amateur Draft from Haines City HS (Haines City, FL). |
07/24/2015 |
Traded by the New York Mets to the Atlanta Braves with P John Gant for IF Kelly Johnson and IF Juan Uribe. |
11/28/2016 |
Traded by the Atlanta Braves to the Seattle Mariners with P Max Povse for OF Alex Jackson and a PTBNL (P Tyler Pike - 12/09/2016). |
03/05/2019 |
Voluntarily retired from the Seattle Mariners. |
11/11/2019 |
Released by the Seattle Mariners. |
01/27/2020 |
Signed as a Free Agent with the New York Mets. |
07/05/2020 |
Injured (Mild shoulder inflammation), day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
11/01/2020 |
Signed a 1-year minor league contract extension with the New York Mets organization. |
01/01/2021 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 50 (50); Movement: 40 (45); Control: 45 (45). |
07/26/2021 |
Released by the New York organization. |
01/01/2022 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 45 (45); Movement: 35 (40); Control: 50 (50). |
01/01/2023 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Stuff: 40 (45); Movement: 30 (35); Control: 50 (50). |